Docket History
7/29/2014
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND DISTRIBUTION
2/19/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY CANCEL SHERIFF'S SALE
2/19/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY CANCEL SHERIFF'S SALE
1/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
1/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
1/28/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY CANICE FOGARTY
10/7/2013
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE Receipt: 946224 Date: 10/08/2013
8/5/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE