Case Information
8/14/2015
2013CV05706
Common Pleas
Connor Group A Real Estate Investment Firmllc
James J. Raney
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION TO DEEM COMPLAINT FILED
Stephen Watring
Docket History
7/31/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
DISCOVERY
7/31/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING IN PART PLAINTIFFS THIRD MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY
7/31/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
OBJECTION SCHEDULE ASSOCIATED WITH FORENSIC SEARCH; SCHEDULING HEARING ON ANY OBJECTIONS TO RESULTS OF FORENSICS SEARCH
7/31/2015
DECISION
SETTING SCHEDULE FOR SUBMISSION OF OBJECTIONS TO DISCOVERY REQUESTS
7/31/2015
DECISION
HOLDING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT IN ABEYANCE PENDING RESOLUTION OF DISCOVERY ISSUES
7/31/2015
DECISION
CLARIFYING PRIOR DISCOVERY ORDERS
7/31/2015
DECISION
SUSTAINING IN PART PLAINTIFFS SECOND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
8/12/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF IN EXCESS OF 20 PAGES
7/22/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANT'S MOTION - SUBMISSION DATE AUGUST 01, 2014
7/22/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO FILE OVERLENGTH BRIEF