State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, Antonio Ross
Barry G Jones
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 2-23-16
Mark Demian
Docket History
2/12/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 2-23-16
2/12/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 2-23-16
6/12/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER CANCELLING STATUS CONFERENCE ST 6/19/14 AT 8:30 A.M. AND RESCHEDULING THE TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON JULY 01, 2014 AT 8:30 AM
6/12/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER CANCELLING STATUS CONFERENCE ST 6/19/14 AT 8:30 A.M. AND RESCHEDULING THE TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON JULY 01, 2014 AT 8:30 AM
6/10/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
AGAINST JILLIAN GEYER FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN SERVICE ON AMENDED COMPLAINT
6/10/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
AGAINST JILLIAN GEYER FOR FAILURE TO OBTAIN SERVICE ON AMENDED COMPLAINT
5/8/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE
5/8/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE
12/9/2013
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON 12-20-13 AT 8:50 AM