ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE AUGUST 21, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE AUGUST 28, 2014
8/7/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE AUGUST 21, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE AUGUST 28, 2014
6/2/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JUNE 16, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JUNE 23, 2014
6/2/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JUNE 16, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JUNE 23, 2014
1/30/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON FEBRUARY 28, 2014, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE BY MARCH 14, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE BY MARCH 21, 2014
1/30/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT ON FEBRUARY 28, 2014, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE BY MARCH 14, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE BY MARCH 21, 2014
1/3/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JANUARY 30, 2014 AT 9:00 AM
1/3/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JANUARY 30, 2014 AT 9:00 AM