ORDER SETTING HEARING
ORDER SETTING HEARING ON MOTION FOR CONTEMPT ON 9/3/14 AT 1:00 P.M.
Docket History
8/27/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
AND ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FILED AUGUST 26, 2014
8/11/2014
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
DEFENDANT TO PROCEED ON COUNTERCLAIM; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY 9/2/14; RESPONSE DUE 9/16/14; REPLY DUE 9/23/14
8/11/2014
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
DEFENDANT TO PROCEED ON COUNTERCLAIM; MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BY 9/2/14; RESPONSE DUE 9/16/14; REPLY DUE 9/23/14
7/24/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT 7/24/14 CONFERENCE
7/24/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
PLAINTIFF'S FAILURE TO APPEAR AT 7/24/14 CONFERENCE
4/22/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO DISCLOSE EXPERT WITNESSES AND REPORTS
4/22/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION OF TIME TO DISCLOSE EXPERT WITNESSES AND REPORTS
2/5/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PAUL T SABA ESQ, BRADLEY M GIBSON ESQ, AND THE LAW FIRM OF FINNEY STAGNARO SABA AND PATTERSON CO LPAS MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFFS USA FREIGHT LLC AND IZMIR KOCH