ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE SEPTEMBER 29, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE OCTOBER 06, 2014
Richard Arthur
Docket History
9/15/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE SEPTEMBER 29, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE OCTOBER 06, 2014
9/5/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 23, 2014 AT 9:15 AM
7/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE AUGUST 12, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE AUGUST 19, 2014
7/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE AUGUST 12, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE AUGUST 19, 2014
4/24/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
12/31/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JANUARY 14, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JANUARY 21, 20104
12/31/2013
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DEFENDANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JANUARY 14, 2014 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JANUARY 21, 20104