Docket History
8/14/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
5/7/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
ENTRY GRANTING SUMMARY AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT, AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
5/7/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
ENTRY GRANTING SUMMARY AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT, AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
3/6/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT
3/6/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT
2/18/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MARCH 25, 2014 AT 9:00 AM
12/19/2013
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE