Case Information
8/14/2014
2014CV00126
Common Pleas
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association
Donald K Minus
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY Thomas Fesenmyer
Matthew McKelvey
Docket History
8/14/2014
NOTICE: BANKRUPCTY - NOTICE OF AUTOMATIC STAY OF EXECUTION
FILED BY Thomas Fesenmyer
7/22/2014
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
ENTRY WITHDRAWING PROPERTY FROM SHERIFF'S SALE
4/8/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/8/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/30/2014
ORDER: SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
1/8/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE