Docket History
4/21/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER VACATING & RE-SCHEDULING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FROM APRIL 24, 2014 TO JUNE 12, 2014 AT 845AM
4/21/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
4/21/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER VACATING & RE-SCHEDULING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FROM APRIL 24, 2014 TO JUNE 12, 2014 AT 845AM
4/21/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
1/17/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
1/17/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
1/13/2014
MEDICAL MALPRACTICE