Case Information
9/12/2014
2014CV00995
Common Pleas
Cindi Parker, William A. Parker Jr
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
Scott Davies, Scott Davies
Docket History
9/12/2014
ORDER: DISMISS - CASE SETTLED
5/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JUNE 13, 2014 AT 10:45 AM
5/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JUNE 13, 2014 AT 10:45 AM
5/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JUNE 13, 2014 AT 10:45 AM
5/22/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
WITHIN 14 DAYS
5/22/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
WITHIN 14 DAYS
5/22/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
WITHIN 14 DAYS
2/18/2014
CIVIL ALL OTHER