Docket History
5/28/2014
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
5/28/2014
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
5/28/2014
ORDER: DISMISS/FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
5/12/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
14 CV 1768
5/12/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
14 CV 1768
5/12/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
14 CV 1768
5/12/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
14 CV 1768
4/25/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
14 CV 1768
4/25/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
14 CV 1768
4/21/2014
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
4/21/2014
ENTRY OF RESTITUTION
3/26/2014
FORCIBLE ENTRY