Docket History
8/14/2014
NOTICE: BANKRUPTCY
FILED BY Thomas Berry
7/23/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 8/5/14 FILED BY BETHANY SUTTINGER
5/16/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
5/16/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
5/16/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
5/12/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/12/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
3/27/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
3/27/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE