Docket History
8/7/2015
NOTICE: 41 A DISMISSAL
WITHOUT PREJUDICE BY DEFENDANT CARIN MILLER FOR COUNTER-DEFENDANTS DEBORAH EVERLY AND DARIN HERRING FILED BY JOSHUA ALBRIGHT
7/31/2015
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO STRIKE COUNTER-DEFENDANTS MOTION IN LIMINE
7/15/2015
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
8/14/2014
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
AS MOOT TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE
8/14/2014
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
AS MOOT TO DISMISS AND MOTION TO STRIKE
7/9/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 12, 2014 AT 9:45 AM
7/9/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 12, 2014 AT 9:45 AM
4/2/2014
CASE TRANSFERRED FROM ANOTHER COURT
4/2/2014
CASE TRANSFERRED FROM ANOTHER COURT