Docket History
2/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 25, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
2/3/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE TRIAL DATE
2/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 25, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
2/3/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE TRIAL DATE
2/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 25, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
2/3/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE TRIAL DATE
2/3/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO EXTEND THE TRIAL DATE
5/6/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 6, 2014 AT 11:30 A.M.
5/6/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 6, 2014 AT 11:30 A.M.
5/6/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 6, 2014 AT 11:30 A.M.
4/18/2014
MEDICAL MALPRACTICE