Docket History
8/14/2014
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
8/11/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT
8/11/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE ANSWER OF THE DEFENDANT
7/25/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RESPONSE DUE 8/6/14; REPLY DUE 8/13/14
7/25/2014
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR JUDGMENT ON THE PLEADINGS RESPONSE DUE 8/6/14; REPLY DUE 8/13/14
7/10/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
7/10/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/9/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
5/9/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE