Case Information
8/11/2014
2014CV03080
Common Pleas
Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Frank D Dugan
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
VOLUNTARY FILED BY Jennifer Powers Receipt: 995164 Date: 08/11/2014
Maria Divita
Docket History
8/11/2014
NOTICE: DISMISSAL ENTRY WITHOUT PREJUDICE
VOLUNTARY FILED BY Jennifer Powers Receipt: 995164 Date: 08/11/2014
7/31/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 9-3-14 @ 9:30 A.M.
7/31/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 9-3-14 @ 9:30 A.M.
7/31/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 9-3-14 @ 9:30 A.M.
7/9/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 7-29-14 @ 9:30 A.M.
7/9/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 7-29-14 @ 9:30 A.M.
5/27/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
5/27/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE