Docket History
7/27/2015
JUDGMENT ENTRY ADOPTING MAGISTRATE DECISION
IN FAVOR OF THE PETITIONER
7/27/2015
JUDGMENT ENTRY ADOPTING MAGISTRATE DECISION
IN FAVOR OF THE PETITIONER
8/14/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON OCTOBER 14, 2014 AT 9:00 AM
8/14/2014
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON OCTOBER 14, 2014 AT 9:00 AM
7/31/2014
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF RESPONDENT FILED BY R NOTHSTINE
7/31/2014
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF RESPONDENT FILED BY R NOTHSTINE
7/31/2014
NOTICE: PARTIAL DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL OF RESPONDENT FILED BY R NOTHSTINE
6/24/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 14, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
6/24/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 14, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
5/27/2014
FORFEITURE OF PROPERTY