Docket History
4/13/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY ANGELA KIRK
4/13/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY ANGELA KIRK
4/13/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY ANGELA KIRK
9/12/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 31, 2014 FILED BY ANGELA KIRK
9/12/2014
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR OCTOBER 31, 2014 FILED BY ANGELA KIRK
8/5/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
8/5/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
6/17/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE