Docket History
9/9/2014
ORDER: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
7/30/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
7/30/2014
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AND DECREE IN FORECLOSURE
7/29/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING DEFENDANT, PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER
7/29/2014
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING DEFENDANT, PNC BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE ANSWER
7/23/2014
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
6/17/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE