Case Information
8/28/2014
2014CV03689
Common Pleas
Nicolas L Pichinte
Abc Professional Tree Services Inc.
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON NOVEMBER 05, 2014 AT 9:00 AM
Marquette Evans
Docket History
7/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
RESET FOR AUGUST 27, 2014 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
7/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
RESET FOR AUGUST 27, 2014 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
7/25/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 20, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
7/25/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 20, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
6/24/2014
NOTICE OF WORKERS COMPENSATION APPEAL Receipt: 986017 Date: 06/24/2014
FILED BY MARQUETTE EVANS
6/24/2014
WORKER COMPENSATION
6/24/2014
NOTICE OF WORKERS COMPENSATION APPEAL Receipt: 986017 Date: 06/24/2014
FILED BY MARQUETTE EVANS