Case Information
9/12/2014
2014CV03716
Common Pleas
Pennie L. Baker
Bureau Of Workers Compensation
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 24, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
Bruce Nicholson
Docket History
9/12/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 24, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
7/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 20, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
7/29/2014
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON AUGUST 20, 2014 AT 9:30 AM
6/25/2014
WORKER COMPENSATION REFILING NEW CASE