Docket History
5/12/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
42038975
5/12/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
42038975
5/12/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
42038975
3/4/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41489613
3/4/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41489613
3/4/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41489613
3/4/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41489613
2/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2016 FILED BY CRAIG THOMAS
2/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2016 FILED BY CRAIG THOMAS
2/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2016 FILED BY CRAIG THOMAS
2/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR MARCH 18, 2016 FILED BY CRAIG THOMAS
1/11/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41028124
1/11/2016
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
41028124
8/14/2015
ORDER: WITHDRAW SHERIFF SALE
39843565
8/14/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE