Case Information
4/13/2016
2014CV05326
Common Pleas
Rahn Fountain Plaza Partnership
Rg Properties Inc
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE MAY 16, 2016 AT 2:00 P.M.
Barry Mancz
Docket History
4/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE MAY 16, 2016 AT 2:00 P.M.
4/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE MAY 16, 2016 AT 2:00 P.M.
4/13/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE MAY 16, 2016 AT 2:00 P.M.
1/25/2016
DECISION
ORDER AND ENTRY OVERRULING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT JZS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
1/25/2016
DECISION
ORDER AND ENTRY OVERRULING THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANT JZS MOTION FOR RECONSIDERATION
8/19/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 10, 2015 AT 2:30 P.M.
8/10/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO CONTINUE TRIAL AND AMEND DATES
9/16/2014
CIVIL ALL OTHER
9/16/2014
CIVIL ALL OTHER