Case Information
5/27/2016
2014CV05574
Common Pleas
Joel Lehmkuhl Equipment Rental Llc
United Demolition Excavation And Site Mngmnt Com
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 24, 2016 AT 9:30 A.M.
Richard Carr
Docket History
5/27/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 24, 2016 AT 9:30 A.M.
3/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING CONTINUANCE; SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MARCH 16, 2016 AT 2:00 PM
3/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING CONTINUANCE; SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MARCH 16, 2016 AT 2:00 PM
3/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING CONTINUANCE; SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MARCH 16, 2016 AT 2:00 PM
3/15/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING CONTINUANCE; SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MARCH 16, 2016 AT 2:00 PM
9/26/2014
DEBT COLLECTION - ORIGINAL HOLDER