Docket History
6/1/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
ON 7/1/16 FILED BY BRADLEY TOMAN
2/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MARCH 17, 2016 AT 830AM
2/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MARCH 17, 2016 AT 830AM
2/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MARCH 17, 2016 AT 830AM
2/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MARCH 17, 2016 AT 830AM
2/24/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON MARCH 17, 2016 AT 830AM
8/21/2015
ORDER: DISMISS - ADMINISTRATIVE
11/21/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE