Docket History
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
3/24/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 7, 2016 FILED BY DAVID BRADY
7/31/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 8-21-15 @ 9:00 A.M.
7/15/2015
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE 7-31-15 @ 9:15 A.M.
12/10/2014
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE