ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ENTRY SETTING SUBMISSION DATES FOR PLAINTIFF'S RENEWED MOTION TO IMPOSE COSTS AND OTHER SANCTIONS
Gary Leppla
Docket History
7/17/2019
DECISION AND ENTRY ACCEPTING VERDICT OF JURY
3/19/2019
DECISION
AND ENTRY GRANTING MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AS TO SPOLIATION CLAIM
5/20/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MAY 25, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
5/20/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MAY 25, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
5/20/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE MAY 25, 2016 AT 8:30 A.M.
5/4/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON MAY 02, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 16, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 23, 2016.
5/4/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED HEREIN ON MAY 02, 2016. RESPONDENT'S MEMORANDUM CONTRA IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 16, 2016. MOVANT'S REPLY IS DUE ON OR BEFORE MAY 23, 2016.
7/22/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE AUGUST 5, 2015 AT 4:00 P.M.