Docket History
5/6/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
5/6/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
5/6/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
4/14/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 19, 2016 AT 930AM
4/14/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 19, 2016 AT 930AM
4/14/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 19, 2016 AT 930AM
4/14/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE ON APRIL 19, 2016 AT 930AM
4/14/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO JOIN NECESSARY PARTIES
4/14/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO JOIN NECESSARY PARTIES
4/14/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO JOIN NECESSARY PARTIES
4/14/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO JOIN NECESSARY PARTIES
7/23/2015
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO ADMIT KENNETH M. LEVINE ESQ PRO HAC VICE
3/27/2015
PROFESSIONAL TORT