Docket History
5/12/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND ORDERING DISTRIBUTION
5/12/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND ORDERING DISTRIBUTION
5/12/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
AND ORDERING DISTRIBUTION
3/7/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY Jillian Henzler
3/7/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY Jillian Henzler
3/7/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY Jillian Henzler
7/24/2015
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
15 CV 2386
5/5/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE