Docket History
4/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND MOTION TO STAY SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION
4/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND MOTION TO STAY SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION
4/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
FOR PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE AND MOTION TO STAY SUMMARY JUDGMENT MOTION
7/29/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
RESCHEDULED VIA TELEPHONE TO SEPTEMBER 4, 2015 AT 10:30 A.M.
7/22/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
VIA TELEPHONE AUGUST 20, 2015 AT 8:30 A.M.
5/14/2015
DECLARATORY JUDGMENT