Case Information
5/18/2016
2015CV03596
Common Pleas
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association
Valerie J Lawson Smith
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 07, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
Richard Lacivita
Docket History
5/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 07, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
5/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 07, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
5/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JUNE 07, 2016 AT 9:15 AM
8/5/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON SEPTEMBER 09, 2015 AT 9:30 AM
7/10/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE