Case Information
1/28/2016
2015CV04843
Common Pleas
Property Management Solutions Unlimited Llc
Christina Marie Mosley Individual
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 12, 2016 AT 10:15 A.M.
Mark Engling
Docket History
1/28/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 12, 2016 AT 10:15 A.M.
1/28/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 12, 2016 AT 10:15 A.M.
1/28/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON FEBRUARY 12, 2016 AT 10:15 A.M.
11/25/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JANUARY 15, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
11/25/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JANUARY 15, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
11/25/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JANUARY 15, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
11/25/2015
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON JANUARY 15, 2016 AT 9:00 A.M.
9/17/2015
CIVIL ALL OTHER