Case Information
4/27/2016
2015CV05048
Common Pleas
Jpmorgan Chase Bank National Association
Anthony D Hackney
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
JUDGMENT ENTRY CONFIRMING SALE AND ORDERING DISTRIBUTION
Douglas Haessig
Docket History
4/27/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
JUDGMENT ENTRY CONFIRMING SALE AND ORDERING DISTRIBUTION
4/27/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
JUDGMENT ENTRY CONFIRMING SALE AND ORDERING DISTRIBUTION
4/27/2016
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
JUDGMENT ENTRY CONFIRMING SALE AND ORDERING DISTRIBUTION
3/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY Brett Housley
3/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY Brett Housley
3/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY Brett Housley
3/8/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
SCHEDULED FOR APRIL 1, 2016 FILED BY Brett Housley
1/21/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/21/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/21/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/21/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
9/28/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE