Docket History
4/29/2016
NOTICE: SHERIFF SALE
FILED BY C CASTERLINE
2/24/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
2/24/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
2/24/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
2/24/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
2/24/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY AND FORECLOSURE DECREE
1/20/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/20/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/20/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/20/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/11/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
DENYING MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME
1/11/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
DENYING MOTION FOR ADDITIONAL TIME
11/2/2015
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE