Docket History
4/18/2016
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER INSTANTER
4/18/2016
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER INSTANTER
4/18/2016
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE AMENDED ANSWER INSTANTER
3/16/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE
3/16/2016
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE
2/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
2/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
2/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:30 AM BY TELEPHONE
11/18/2015
CIVIL ALL OTHER
11/18/2015
CIVIL ALL OTHER