ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
Pro Se
Docket History
3/16/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE
3/8/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE CONNS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/8/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE SHAFERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/8/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE CONNS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/8/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE SHAFERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/8/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE CONNS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/8/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE SHAFERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/8/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE CONNS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
3/8/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE SHAFERS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
2/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE FEBRUARY 26, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE MARCH 04, 2016
2/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE FEBRUARY 26, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE MARCH 04, 2016
2/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTIONS FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT -- RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE FEBRUARY 26, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE MARCH 04, 2016
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
TO TRANSFER
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE CONNS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
TO TRANSFER
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE CONNS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
TO TRANSFER
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE CONNS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
TO TRANSFER
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
OVERRULE CONNS MOTION FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT
1/21/2016
DECISION OVERRULING MOTION
FOR JUDGMENT BY DEFAULT