Docket History
5/17/2016
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT Receipt: 1102303 Date: 05/17/2016
5/6/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0193
5/6/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0193
5/6/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0193
5/6/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
16 CV 0193
2/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING ADDITIONAL TIME
2/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING ADDITIONAL TIME
2/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING ADDITIONAL TIME
2/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING ADDITIONAL TIME
2/24/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING ADDITIONAL TIME
1/13/2016
OTHER TORT
1/13/2016
OTHER TORT