Docket History
5/17/2016
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT Receipt: 1102321 Date: 05/17/2016
5/11/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/11/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/11/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/11/2016
NOTICE: DISMISSAL - FAILURE TO PROSECUTE FILED; SHOW CAUSE WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/13/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/13/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/13/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/13/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
1/14/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER
1/14/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER