Docket History
3/16/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON APRIL 19, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
2/24/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
VC
2/24/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
VC
2/24/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
VC
2/24/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
VC
2/24/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
VC
2/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
2/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
2/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
BY TELEPHONE ON MARCH 15, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
1/14/2016
FORFEITURE OF PROPERTY
1/14/2016
FORFEITURE OF PROPERTY