Docket History
5/18/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 31, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
5/18/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 31, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
5/18/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 31, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
3/15/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 17, 2016 AT 8:50 AM
3/15/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 17, 2016 AT 8:50 AM
3/15/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 17, 2016 AT 8:50 AM
3/15/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON MAY 17, 2016 AT 8:50 AM
3/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MARCH 15, 2016 AT 8:50 AM
3/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MARCH 15, 2016 AT 8:50 AM
3/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MARCH 15, 2016 AT 8:50 AM
3/3/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MARCH 15, 2016 AT 8:50 AM
2/2/2016
MEDICAL MALPRACTICE
2/2/2016
MEDICAL MALPRACTICE