Docket History
5/19/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1102731 Date: 05/19/2016
5/19/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1102731 Date: 05/19/2016
5/19/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY Receipt: 1102731 Date: 05/19/2016
5/4/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
EXTENDING DEADLINE TO 5-27-16 TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION
5/4/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
EXTENDING DEADLINE TO 5-27-16 TO FILE DISPOSITIVE MOTION
4/14/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/14/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/14/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/14/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
2/9/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER
2/9/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER
2/9/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER