Docket History
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON JULY 05, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON JULY 05, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
5/6/2016
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON JULY 05, 2016 AT 9:30 AM
4/26/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MAY 06, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
4/26/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON MAY 06, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
2/24/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
2/24/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
2/24/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE