Docket History
5/27/2016
JUDGMENT ENTRY
5/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DUE 5/31/16; REPLY DUE 6/7/16
5/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DUE 5/31/16; REPLY DUE 6/7/16
5/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DUE 5/31/16; REPLY DUE 6/7/16
5/18/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT RESPONSE DUE 5/31/16; REPLY DUE 6/7/16
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON APRIL 22, 2016 AT 8:40 AM
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON APRIL 22, 2016 AT 8:40 AM
4/7/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
ORDER SETTING TELEPHONE PRETRIAL SCHEDULINGCONFERENCE ON APRIL 22, 2016 AT 8:40 AM
3/2/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
3/2/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
3/2/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE