Docket History
5/19/2016
ORDER: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Receipt: 1102758 Date: 05/19/2016
5/19/2016
ORDER: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Receipt: 1102758 Date: 05/19/2016
5/19/2016
ORDER: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE Receipt: 1102758 Date: 05/19/2016
5/6/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/6/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/6/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
5/6/2016
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
4/7/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION TO MAY 2, 2016 TO FILE ANSWER
4/7/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION TO MAY 2, 2016 TO FILE ANSWER
4/7/2016
ENTRY SIGNED BY JUDGE
GRANTING EXTENSION TO MAY 2, 2016 TO FILE ANSWER
3/2/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
3/2/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE
3/2/2016
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE