Case Information
5/12/2016
2016CV01331
Common Pleas
Donald E Atchley
David M Klopf
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DESPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
Pro Se
Docket History
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DESPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DESPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
5/12/2016
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
ON DESPOSITIVE MOTIONS ON JUNE 10, 2016, RESPONDENT'S REPLY DUE JUNE 24, 2016 AND MOVANT'S RESPONSE DUE JULY 01, 2016
4/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
IN CHAMBERS ON MAY 12, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
4/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
IN CHAMBERS ON MAY 12, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
4/6/2016
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
IN CHAMBERS ON MAY 12, 2016 AT 9:00 AM
3/10/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER
3/10/2016
CIVIL ALL OTHER