Docket History
2/20/2020
DECISION
SUSTAINING DEFENDANT KETTERING MEDICAL CENTERS MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT REGARDING PUNITIVE DAMAGES
2/20/2020
DECISION
OVERRULING DEFENDANT KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER'S MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT
12/6/2019
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANT KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER MOTION FOR PARTIAL SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SUBMISSION DATE JANUARY 10, 2020
11/15/2019
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
DEFENDANT, KETTERING MEDICAL CENTER, MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT - SUBMISSION DATE DECEMBER 23, 2019
8/23/2019
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
ENTRY SETTING TELEPHONE STATUS CONFERENCE ON OCTOBER 24, 2019 AT 2:00 PM
5/6/2019
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
5/6/2019
DECISION
SUSTAINING MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT