Docket History
8/15/2019
ORDER: DISMISS WITHOUT PREJUDICE
7/23/2019
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE
TELEPHONE CONFERENCE SET FOR 9/20/19 AT 9:30 A.M.
5/22/2019
ENTRY
ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT Receipt: 1253304 Date: 05/22/2019
5/22/2019
ENTRY
ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT Receipt: 1253304 Date: 05/22/2019
5/22/2019
ENTRY
ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT Receipt: 1253304 Date: 05/22/2019
5/22/2019
ENTRY
ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR DEFAULT Receipt: 1253304 Date: 05/22/2019
4/1/2019
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
11/15/2018
OTHER TORT