Case Information
11/1/2019
2019CV00130
Common Pleas
Montgomery County Treasurer
Sherry Anne Zimmer Deceased
ORDER: CONFIRMATION OF SALE
Michele Phipps Pl
Docket History
5/22/2019
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE, AMENDED
5/22/2019
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE, AMENDED
5/22/2019
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE, AMENDED
5/22/2019
ORDER: DEFAULT JUDGMENT
AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE, AMENDED
5/1/2019
NOTICE: FILE DEFAULT MOTION WITHIN 14 DAYS
.
3/11/2019
ORDER: SERVICE BY PUBLICATION
1/8/2019
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE