Case Information
10/29/2019
2019CV00906
Common Pleas
Silver Creek Condominium Association
Adam Feldmeyer
DECISION
VACATING JUDGMENT ENRY AND DECREE OF FORECLOSURE AND SETTING AMENDED SUBMISSION DATE
Magdalena Myers
Docket History
10/24/2019
ORDER SETTING SUBMISSION DATE
.
5/30/2019
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JUNE 18, 2019 AT 9:30 A.M. BY TELEPHONE
5/30/2019
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JUNE 18, 2019 AT 9:30 A.M. BY TELEPHONE
5/30/2019
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JUNE 18, 2019 AT 9:30 A.M. BY TELEPHONE
5/30/2019
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JUNE 18, 2019 AT 9:30 A.M. BY TELEPHONE
5/30/2019
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE
JUNE 18, 2019 AT 9:30 A.M. BY TELEPHONE
2/26/2019
MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE