Case Information
10/18/2012
2010DR00250
Common Pleas
Frances B Haidet
Magdalene P Haidet (polsinelli)
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- NOVEMBER 27, 2012 @ 3:30 PM
Mark Fisher
Docket History
8/27/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- OCTOBER 23, 2012 @ 11:00 AM
6/29/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- AUGUST 13, 2012 @ 11:00 AM
6/25/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 18, 2012 @ 3:30 PM
6/14/2012
ENTRY GRANTING CONTINUANCE FILED: HRG- JULY 3, 2012 @ 11:00 AM
12/15/2011
Notice of appearance of Counsel for Plaintiff
12/15/2011
Plaintiff's Motion for Continuance
12/15/2011
Entry GRANTING Continuance; continued to Jan 12, 2012
11/14/2011
SUMMONS - CONTEMPT